Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Smart Meters - Disclosure of Usage Data
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, Arentz, Arora, Braveboy, Carr, Carter, Conaway, Donoghue, Dwyer, Elliott, Fisher, Frank, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Harper, Hogan, Hough, Jacobs, James, Kach, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, McMillan, A. Miller, W. Miller, Morhaim, Myers, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, O'Donnell, Olszewski, Otto, Parrott, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Simmons, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Stein, Stukes, Swain, Szeliga, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Vitale, Waldstreicher, Walker, M. Washington, Wood, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an electric company from disclosing specified data to a third party, subject to specified exceptions; authorizing a customer to submit a specified complaint to the Public Service Commission under specified circumstances; requiring the Commission to conduct a specified investigation following receipt of a complaint; authorizing the Commission to take specified actions; making an electric company liable for unauthorized disclosures of specified information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0280
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1066 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-302.1, 7-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM