Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Sponsored by
Delegates Mitchell, Anderson, Conaway, Haynes, McIntosh, Oaks, B. Robinson, Stukes, Tarrant, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "economic development project" used for specified provisions of law relating to payment in lieu of taxes agreements in Baltimore City to remove the requirement that the project must be located in a specified urban renewal area; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0900
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {565269/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {565269/1 Report Adopted 51
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 53A
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 52
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-504.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM