Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Delegate Boyce
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain provisions of law do not apply to certain individuals; prohibiting individuals from simultaneously being a candidate for a party office and an elected public office; and prohibiting individuals from simultaneously holding a party office and an elected public office.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0873 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/19/2020
Legislative Date
6/19/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/19/2020 6/19/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 2:13 PM