Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of Age
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Barkley, Beidle, Burns, Elliott, Kaiser, Stocksdale, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual under the age of 21 years from playing a table game or video lottery terminal in a video lottery facility; providing that it is a Code violation and a civil offense for an individual under the age of 21 years to play a table game or video lottery terminal in a video lottery facility; providing that a person who violates the Act shall be issued a citation; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; establishing procedures for the issuance of a citation under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0009
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1274 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-136, 10-137 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM