Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsored by
Delegates Vallario, Anderson, Atterbeary, Carter, Conaway, Dumais, Glass, Kittleman, Moon, Morales, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, Sydnor, Tarlau, and Valentino-Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the forfeiture of specified property under specified circumstances; repealing a specified provision authorizing the forfeiture of specified money or weapons relating to possession of a controlled dangerous substance; requiring that a specified seizing authority provide a receipt for property on seizure that includes specified information; requiring that a specified seizing authority mail notice with specified information to the owner of seized property within a specified period of time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0161
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {192910/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-48)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {708579/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-18)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {192910/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (85-48) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {708579/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (121-18) 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-104, 12-203, 12-212, 12-304, 12-312, 12-313, 12-405, 12-601, 12-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM