Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Robinson, Barkley, Beidle, Bobo, Carr, Frush, Gutierrez, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, A. Kelly, Lee, Luedtke, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, B. Robinson, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from engaging in the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0514
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/08/2013 3/12/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-107.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM