Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel and Atterbeary
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to examine the composition and purpose of the Orphans' Courts in Maryland and make recommendations about how to improve the orphans' courts in Maryland; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0914 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {912415/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-14)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {912415/1 Adopted 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (118-14) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:45 PM