Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates McKay and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Director of the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency to issue certain fraternal organizations a license for not more than five instant ticket lottery machines; providing that proceeds from instant ticket lottery machine sales by a fraternal organization are to be distributed in a certain manner; and authorizing certain fraternal organizations to purchase or lease instant ticket lottery machines from any vendor approved by the Agency to sell or lease the machines to fraternal organizations.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0260 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM