Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Student Transportation Safety Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Miele, Fraser-Hidalgo, Angel, Barkley, Ciliberti, Ebersole, Folden, Frush, Glenn, Jones, McDonough, Pena-Melnyk, Sophocleus, Stein, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified school vehicles in the State to be equipped with seat belts; prohibiting a person from operating school vehicles unless the person and each occupant are restrained by a seat belt; authorizing a local school system or a nonpublic school to establish policies regarding the restraint of pupils by seat belts on school vehicles; requiring the operator of a school vehicle to notify the local school system or the nonpublic school the student attends if the student fails to comply with seat belt requirements; etc
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Student Transportation Safety Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Student Transportation Safety Act
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-153, 11-154, 11-173, 11-174, 16-113, 22-412, 22-412.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM