Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, B. Barnes, Acevero, Atterbeary, Barron, Bartlett, Barve, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glenn, Healey, Hettleman, Jalisi, Kaiser, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Queen, Reznik, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program; providing for the manner in which the Program is to be administered; providing for the powers and duties of the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation under the Program; requiring, beginning on January 1, 2020, certain employees and employers to pay the Secretary certain contributions; requiring, beginning on July 1, 2021, an individual to meet certain conditions to be eligible for benefits; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2019)
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8.3-101 through 8.3-901, 8-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM