Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Lam, Morales, Barve, Carr, Cullison, Ebersole, Gilchrist, Hixson, Jalisi, Kelly, Krimm, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a unit from awarding a procurement contract to a specified contractor unless the contractor has a specified equal pay certificate or a specified written exemption; requiring a specified contractor to apply for an equal pay certificate by submitting to the Commissioner of Labor and Industry a specified application fee and a specified statement; authorizing the Commissioner to revoke or suspend an equal pay certificate under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0993
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Reassigned to Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations 17
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-203, 17-801 through 17-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM