Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement and Workers' Compensation Benefits - Offsets
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting ordinary disability retirement benefits from the requirement to be offset by related workers' compensation benefits; repealing the requirement for the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to reduce accidental or special disability retirement benefits by related workers' compensation benefits; and requiring the Workers' Compensation Commission to reduce workers' compensation benefits by related accidental or special disability retirement benefits under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0751
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters Appropriations
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement and Workers' Compensation Benefits - Offsets
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Reassigned to Economic Matters Appropriations 16
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM