Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Continuing Care Agreements - Termination - Notice and Contractual Entrance Fee Refunds
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, Barron, Brooks, Fennell, Gaines, Haynes, Healey, Hill, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Kipke, Knotts, Korman, Lierman, A. Miller, Sample-Hughes, Stein, Sydnor, Turner, West, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that certain continuing care agreements contain a certain statement relating to contractual entrance fee refunds; requiring that a certain notice to terminate a certain continuing care agreement be given to the provider at least 30 days before the effective date of termination; and altering from 60 days to 30 days the period of time within which certain continuing care providers are required to pay certain contractual entrance fee refunds.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Continuing Care Agreements - Termination - Notice and Contractual Entrance Fee Refunds
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-401, 10-444, 10-449 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM