Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act – Requirements for State Agencies and Local Boards of Elections (Maryland Transparency Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring State agencies in the Executive Branch and local boards of elections to make publicly available on their websites an agenda and all meeting materials at least 48 hours in advance of each open meeting or, under certain circumstances, as far in advance of the meeting as practicable; requiring State agencies and local boards of elections to make publicly available on their websites live video or audio streaming of each portion of a certain meeting, and a certain recording for a minimum of 1 year after the date of the meeting; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0072
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/08/2020
Legislative Date
10/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/08/2020 10/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Open Meetings Act – Requirements for State Agencies and Local Boards of Elections (Maryland Transparency Act of 2021)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 4:17 PM