Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County Liquor Control Board - Reserve Account
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Reserve Account of the Harford County Liquor Control Board as a special, nonlapsing account; specifying the purpose of the Reserve Account; requiring the Board to hold the Account separately and account for the Reserve Account; specifying the contents of the Reserve Account; specifying a maximum amount that is payable annually into the Reserve Account; requiring that fines imposed or recognizances forfeited for specified violations be payable to the Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0131
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573198/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments {573198/1 Report Adopted 43
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-204, 16-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM