Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Barkley, Barve, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gilchrist, Hixson, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Luedtke, A. Miller, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Waldstreicher, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a civil action for specified damages may be brought under specified circumstances against an alcoholic beverages licensee or the licensee's employee who sells or furnishes alcoholic beverages to an individual who was visibly under the influence of alcoholic beverages and who negligently drove or attempted to drive a motor vehicle after consuming the alcoholic beverages; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0102 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2101 through 3-2105, 5-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM