Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Professional Engineers - Firm Permits
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a corporation, partnership, or limited liability company on or after October 1, 2015, to hold a permit issued by the State Board for Professional Engineers before operating a business through which engineering is practiced, with a specified exception; establishing qualifications, application requirements, and fees for the firm permit to practice engineering; establishing the scope of the engineering firm permit; providing for the renewal and reinstatement of the engineering firm permit; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553390/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-39)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {124738/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-28)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {553390/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (97-39) 48A
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {124738/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 60
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (103-28) 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101, 14-401, 14-402, 14-402 through 14-415, 14-403, 14-501.1, 14-502.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM