Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cybersecurity Investment Fund and Enterprise Fund - Higher Education Loan Repayment - Expanded Use
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the authorized uses of the Cybersecurity Investment Fund and the Enterprise Fund within the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to include authorizing specified companies to use funding received from the Fund to assist in the repayment of higher education loans owed by employees of the company who meet specified income limits; requiring companies that use specified funding to assist specified employees in the repayment of higher education loans to provide a specified amount of company funding to the employees; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations
Text - First - Cybersecurity Investment Fund and Enterprise Fund - Higher Education Loan Repayment - Expanded Use
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-464, 10-469, 5-514 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page