Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Dumais
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the budget bill for each fiscal year a specified appropriation to provide legal representation to income-eligible parties in protective order proceedings; establishing a Judicare Pilot Program to provide legal representation to income-eligible parents in contested custody and visitation proceedings in specified jurisdictions; requiring the Governor to include in the budget bill for each fiscal year a specified appropriation to fund the pilot program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0468
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-512.2, 9-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM