Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commonsense Spending Act of 2018
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Cluster, Corderman, Fisher, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Vogt, West, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, beginning in fiscal year 2020, any appropriation that increases by operation of law is required to have its mandated level of spending increased by the lesser of the amount of the existing formula calculation or 1% less than the amount of General Fund revenue growth in a certain report submitted by the Board of Revenue Estimates; providing that the General Assembly may not enact certain legislation that creates a certain mandated level of funding except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0293
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0303 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commonsense Spending Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Commonsense Spending Act of 2018
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM