Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Grammer, Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Angel, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Bromwell, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Chang, Ciliberti, Cluster, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Fisher, Flanagan, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gaines, Ghrist, Glass, Glenn, Hammen, Hayes, Hettleman, Hill, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jackson, Jacobs, Jalisi, Kelly, Kipke, Kittleman, Korman, Krebs, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McCray, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, A. Miller, W. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Platt, Reilly, Rey, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rose, Rosenberg, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Smith, Stein, Sydnor, Szeliga, Tarlau, Vogt, A. Washington, West, C. Wilson, Wivell, K. Young, P. Young, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an Executive Branch agency from banning or regulating the sale of coffee in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity in a public high school in Baltimore County; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1162
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {435264/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884132/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-2)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {435264/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {884132/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-2) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-423.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM