Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Delegates Miele, Afzali, Angel, Aumann, Barkley, Brooks, Cassilly, Chang, Ciliberti, Cluster, Ebersole, Folden, Frush, Grammer, Hixson, Holmes, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jalisi, Krebs, Long, McConkey, Metzgar, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Sophocleus, Szeliga, Turner, Valentino-Smith, C. Wilson, P. Young, Ali, D. Barnes, Buckel, C. Howard, Kaiser, Luedtke, McMillan, Mosby, Patterson, Reilly, Simonaire, Tarlau, Walker, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for specified wages paid by small businesses to qualified veteran employees; prohibiting a small business from claiming the credit for a qualified veteran employee who is hired to replace a laid-off or striking employee; requiring the Department of Commerce, on application of a small business, to issue a tax credit certificate under specified circumstances; providing that the total amount of credit certificates issued may not exceed $500,000; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0807
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {165667/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {329033/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {165667/1 Adopted 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {329033/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Wages Paid to Qualified Veteran Employees (Hire Our Veterans Act of 2017)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM