Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Occupational and Professional Licensing - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Revisions to Reciprocity Requirements
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Arikan, Beitzel, Buckel, Cardin, Charles, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Clark, Corderman, Cox, Ghrist, Griffith, Hartman, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Pippy, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Wilson, Wivell, Brooks, Charkoudian, Crosby, Dumais, Fennell, M. Fisher, Impallaria, C. Jackson, Miller, Qi, Rogers, Turner, Valderrama, Walker, and C. Watson
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the application requirements for a service member, veteran, or military spouse to apply for an occupational or professional license from a unit in the Maryland Department of Labor to require submission of proof that the applicant has held a license in good standing from another state for at least 1 year; authorizing the issuance of a temporary license to certain individuals who have held a valid license from another state for less than 1 year provided that the license is in good standing; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0280
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443190/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Occupational and Professional Licensing - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Revisions to Reciprocity Requirements
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {443190/1 Adopted 30
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Occupational and Professional Licensing - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Revisions to Reciprocity Requirements
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:21 AM