Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Dumais, Rey, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a court, in any child custody or visitation proceeding, from making any negative inference regarding a parent's past, present, or future deployment; altering specified provisions relating to expedited hearings; authorizing a party or witness who is subject to deployment to provide testimony and present evidence by electronic means or by telephone under specified circumstances; authorizing a court to grant custody or visitation on behalf of a deployed parent to another individual under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM