Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Civil Action for Law Enforcement Officer Conduct - Nondisclosure Agreements
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Anderton, Angel, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Branch, Brooks, Carter, Conaway, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Kelly, Korman, Lierman, Mautz, McCray, McIntosh, Metzgar, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morgan, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Sydnor, Valderrama, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a plaintiff in a civil action against a law enforcement officer or law enforcement agency for injuries resulting from law enforcement officer misconduct may not be required, as a part of a settlement of the civil action, to agree not to disclose to a third party information about the action; providing a specified immunity for a violation of a specified settlement agreement; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0608 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM