Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Anderson, Atterbeary, and Jackson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a driver of a motor vehicle from smoking or consuming marijuana in a passenger area of a motor vehicle on a highway; and prohibiting an occupant of a motor vehicle from smoking marijuana in a passenger area of a motor vehicle on a highway.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0418
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0651 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM