Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Land Use and Vehicle Miles Traveled Workgroup
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Lierman, Barron, Boyce, Hettleman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Solomon, Terrasa, and Wells
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Land Use and Vehicle Miles Traveled Workgroup to develop a State strategy that identifies State and local land use policies, business incentives, and transportation policies, investment and programs for certain purposes; authorizing the Workgroup to establish subcommittees and collaborate with expert witnesses; requiring the Workgroup to report its final findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 31, 2021; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Land Use and Vehicle Miles Traveled Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Land Use and Vehicle Miles Traveled Workgroup
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/13/2020 9:48 AM