Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Civil Penalties - Citation Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the authority of the State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors to impose a specified civil penalty on a person, whether or not the person is licensed by the Board; authorizing an investigator employed by the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to issue a specified civil citation on behalf of the Board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9A-505, 9A-505.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM