Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of a condominium to convene at least two meetings each year; requiring a developer of a condominium or a declarant of a homeowners association to convene a certain annual meeting under certain circumstances; requiring certain meetings to include an opportunity for certain unit owners or lot owners to provide comment; requiring the developer of a condominium to appoint a unit owner to the board of directors within 30 days after 25% of the currently subdivided units have been conveyed to the public; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1053 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2020
Legislative Date
10/02/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/02/2020 10/02/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 2:21 PM