Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Military Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegates Aumann, Afzali, Arentz, Bates, Beitzel, Boteler, Bromwell, Cardin, Clagett, Cluster, DeBoy, Frank, Hogan, Jacobs, Kach, Krebs, McComas, McDermott, Myers, Norman, Schuh, Schulz, Serafini, Stifler, Stocksdale, Szeliga, and Weir
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the subtraction modification under the State income tax from $5,000 to $10,000 of military retirement income received for retirees at least 65 years old on the last day of the taxable year; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0143
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM