Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Monetary Penalty for Fraud
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to recover from a claimant a specified monetary penalty under specified circumstances; altering the amount of interest the Secretary may recover under specified circumstances; specifying how specified funds recovered by the Secretary are to be applied; requiring a person who violates a specified provision of law to pay a specified monetary penalty; excluding specified monetary penalties from the amount that can be recovered by the Secretary through a specified method; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Second Reading Passed 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Finance 50
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Returned Passed 60A
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1305, 8-404, 8-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM