Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers (Hometown Heroes Act of 2018)
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Cluster, Corderman, Fisher, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including certain individuals employed by the Department of Juvenile Services in the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under certain circumstances for a certain amount of retirement income attributable to an individual's employment as a correctional officer; applying certain provisions of the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0299
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers (Hometown Heroes Act of 2018)
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM