Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to help establish and expand programs for survivors of homicide victims in the State; requiring the programs to serve survivors of homicide victims in all parts of the State; requiring the programs to include specified elements; requiring the Office to award specified grants; requiring the Office to regularly consult, collaborate with, and consider the recommendations of specified service providers on specified matters; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1088
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {408572/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 35
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 36
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {408572/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 56
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM