Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission from discriminating against a person on the basis of religion, marital status, or gender identity; and altering a nondiscrimination clause required in all contracts entered into by the Commission to require the contractor not to discriminate in any manner against an employee or applicant for employment on the basis of religion, marital status, or gender identity and require the contractor to include a similar nondiscrimination clause in all subcontracts.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Text - Chapter - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-402, 20-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM