Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Rates for Gas and Electricity - Discount for Qualified Residential Customers in Baltimore City
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to issue an order that sets specified rates for electricity and gas for specified residential customers in Baltimore City who are 55 years old or older and have been customers of the electric company, gas company, or electric and gas company for at least 1 year at a level 10% lower than the rates for other residential customers in Baltimore City.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Rates for Gas and Electricity - Discount for Qualified Residential Customers in Baltimore City
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page