Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Clark, Cluster, Corderman, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Vogt, West, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting multimember delegate districts; creating the General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission; requiring the Commission to divide the State to create certain General Assembly legislative districts and congressional districts; establishing exclusive and original jurisdiction for the Court of Appeals to establish legislative districts and congressional districts under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0307
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Contingency - on a referendum
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-7A-01 through 8-7A-14 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM