Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Barnes, Beidle, Carr, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Healey, Holmes, Knotts, Lafferty, Lam, McCray, McIntosh, Pena-Melnyk, S. Robinson, Stein, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the driver of a motor vehicle in which a person who is under the age of 8 years is a passenger from smoking a tobacco product or allowing a passenger to smoke in the motor vehicle; establishing a fine of up to $50 for a violation of the Act; specifying that the Act does not apply to a mobile home under specified circumstances; specifying that a violation of the Act is not a moving violation for purposes of the assessment of points; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0585 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1130, 27-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM