Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's License Fees - Alteration
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Corderman, Fisher, Folden, Ghrist, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time to pay certain manufacturer's license fees from annually to one time; altering the amount of certain manufacturer's license fees; providing that prorating of certain fees for certain licenses does not apply to a license for which there is no annual fee; and providing that a manufacturer's license does not expire on a certain date after its issuance.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0311
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's License Fees - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's License Fees - Alteration
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2-202, 2-203, 2-204, 2-205, 2-206, 2-207, 2-208, 2-209, 2-210, 3-109, 3-202, 3-204, 3-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM