Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsored by
Delegates Vallario, Morales, Anderson, Atterbeary, Campos, Carter, Conaway, Dumais, Frush, Glass, Jalisi, Kramer, Moon, Rey, Reznik, Rosenberg, Smith, Sydnor, Valentino-Smith, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (87-51)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a presumption that specified money or weapons are forfeitable; prohibiting a seizing authority or prosecuting authority from directly or indirectly transferring seized property to a federal law enforcement authority or agency, with a specified exception; requiring a specified law enforcement agency to report, on an annual basis, specified information about each individual seizure and forfeiture completed by the agency under State or federal forfeiture law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0528
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {612410/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (81-54)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {328479/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Delegates Dumais, Sydnor, and Kittleman
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senators Raskin, Ramirez, and Norman
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-53)
Proceedings
72
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {612410/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 35
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Motion vote previous question (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (81-54) 40
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 40
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {328479/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1) 56
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Delegates Dumais, Sydnor, and Kittleman 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Refuses to Recede 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senators Raskin, Ramirez, and Norman 63
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (85-53) 72
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-103, 12-211, 12-312, 13-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM