Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Foster Care Recipients
Sponsored by
Delegates Jalisi, Afzali, Brooks, Carey, Ebersole, Glass, Hornberger, McComas, McMillan, Metzgar, Moon, Platt, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Shoemaker, Tarlau, A. Washington, M. Washington, C. Wilson, and Jackson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Foster Care Recipients; requiring an applicant to be employed for at least 20 hours per week by the State or a county or municipality of the State and have received an undergraduate or graduate degree from an institution of higher education in the State; requiring specified governmental agencies and entities to provide their employees with information about the Program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0073
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {845962/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614938/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Delegates M. Washington, Tarlau, and Metzgar
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senators Young, Kagan, and Salling
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {845962/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {614938/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 60
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Delegates M. Washington, Tarlau, and Metzgar 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senators Young, Kagan, and Salling 63
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 72
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-2) 72
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 68
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-3101 through 18-3107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM