Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Public School System - Audit Exemption - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making the Baltimore City Public School System ineligible to request an exemption from a specified audit of the school system performed by the Office of Legislative Audits at specified intervals; and requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to begin a specified audit of the Baltimore City Public School System as soon as possible.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City Public School System - Audit Exemption - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Baltimore City Public School System - Audit Exemption - Prohibition
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM