Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Fee Exemption, Disbursements, and Financial Assistance (Septic Stewardship Act of 2018)
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Cluster, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Vogt, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a user of an on-site sewage disposal system from paying the Bay Restoration Fee under certain circumstances; authorizing certain fee revenue collected for the Bay Restoration Fund to be used for financial assistance to certain homeowners for the reasonable cost of pumping out on-site sewage disposal systems; specifying that financial assistance under the Act may be provided only if the homeowner resides in a local jurisdiction that has developed a certain plan that meets certain conditions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0314
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund - Fee Exemption, Disbursements, and Financial Assistance (Septic Stewardship Act of 2018)
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1605.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM