Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Study of Solar Photovoltaic System - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs, in consultation with the Maryland Energy Administration, the Public Service Commission, and other specified entities to study the benefits, costs, and feasibility of installing a specified solar photovoltaic system at Charlotte Hall Veterans Home; and requiring the Department to submit a report of specified findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM