Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Recurring Automatic Orders - Notice of Method of Contract Cancellation
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a merchant that provides or sells consumer goods or consumer services by mail or over the telephone under a specified contract with a consumer to include or send a written notice that includes specified information on how to cancel the contract to the consumer under specified circumstances; and providing for a specified penalty.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Recurring Automatic Orders - Notice of Method of Contract Cancellation
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101, 14-1321 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM