Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - College Admissions Outreach Program for High-Achieving Students - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Platt, and Reznik
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Delegate Howard P. Rawlings Program of Educational Excellence Awards in the State to be awarded to the neediest students to ensure the payment of 100 percnet of educational costs and to low and moderate income students for payment assistance; establishing the College Admissions Outreach Program for High-Achieving Students; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission and the Maryland State Department of Education to jointly administer the Program; etc
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0534
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0854 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-301, 18-303, 18-303.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM