Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Minors - Sealing of Court Records
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, and A. Miller
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified individual to file a motion requesting that court records relating to a specified petition for emergency evaluation be sealed; requiring the court to have a copy of the motion served on a specified petitioner at a specified address; clarifying that a specified provision of law allowing the review of specified court records by specified persons and entities does not apply to the review of specified court records that have been sealed under specified provisions of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0354
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {336383/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {336383/1 Report Adopted 36
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 38
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings 38
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM