Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsored by
Delegates Conway, Costa, DeBoy, Malone, Otto, Rudolph, Weir, Wood, Bromwell, Donoghue, Elliott, Hammen, Hubbard, Kach, Kipke, Krebs, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Ready, Reznik, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Senator William H. Amoss Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Fund to be used to acquire land for a specified purpose; authorizing funds to be used to install specified systems and to acquire telecommunication devices, computers, equipment, and machinery under specified circumstances; providing that funds be distributed to volunteer companies based on need; requiring a county to distribute money to volunteer companies located in qualified municipalities; defining terms; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0254
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {456380/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments {456380/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 43A
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 42
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/18/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/18/2014 3/18/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-101, 8-102, 8-103, 8-104, 8-105, 8-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM