Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegates Walker, Hixson, Ali, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Busch, Carey, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gibson, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, Wilson, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the determination of the number of exemptions that an individual may use to calculate a certain deduction under the Maryland income tax; requiring the Bureau of Revenue Estimates, in consultation with the Consensus Revenue Monitoring and Forecasting Group, to review and update a certain report relating to certain federal tax changes and to include certain information in the updated report; requiring the Bureau to submit the updated report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 15, 2018; and applying the Act.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0184
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {865567/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {589834/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, Buckel and Ebersole)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, Buckel and Ebersole)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Motion Recede (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Committee Amendment {589834/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {865567/1 Adopted 40
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 43
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {589834/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 60
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 60
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, Buckel and Ebersole) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, Buckel and Ebersole) 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Motion Recede (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Senate Recede 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Committee Amendment {589834/1 Withdrawn 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Senate Recede 61
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Alteration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM