Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Grants and Contracts - Reimbursement of Nonprofit Indirect Costs - Application
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Applying a certain provision of law related to the reimbursement of indirect costs incurred by certain nonprofit organizations to certain grants and contracts; providing that a certain provision of law does not require the reimbursement of indirect costs incurred under certain grants and contracts during any fiscal year that began before July 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0017
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {256884/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Grants and Contracts - Reimbursement of Nonprofit Indirect Costs - Application
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {256884/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Grants and Contracts - Reimbursement of Nonprofit Indirect Costs - Application
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 640
Text - Chapter - State Grants and Contracts - Reimbursement of Nonprofit Indirect Costs - Application
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page