Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
District Court Commissioners - Arrest Warrants - Recall and Issuance of a Summons
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin and Crutchfield
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a judge of the District Court or a judge of a circuit court, on a finding of good cause, to recall an arrest warrant issued by a District Court commissioner and issue a summons in its place.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1599 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - District Court Commissioners - Arrest Warrants - Recall and Issuance of a Summons
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 3:14 PM